Global Patent Index - EP 0855980 B1

EP 0855980 B1 2001-02-28 - SLIDING WALL ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

SLIDING WALL ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

SCHIEBEWANDANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PAROIS COULISSANTES

Publication

EP 0855980 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96929312 A

Priority

EP 9603714 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807606A1] The invention concerns a sliding wall arrangement for railway goods wagons covered by a fixed roof (4), wherein the sliding wall parts (5), which, in the closed state, lie in a plane, can be moved in the transverse direction of the wagon at the bottom out of a closure plane into a displacement plane and placed on a lower slide rail (11). For opening, the sliding wall parts (5) can be displaced in the longitudinal direction of the wagon by means of rollers (10) over the other closed sliding wall parts (5) and intermediate uprights (6) between the sliding wall parts (5). The object of the invention is to produce a sliding wall arrangement for railway goods wagons, wherein, for opening purposes, the sliding wall parts are moved out of their closed position into the displacement position and are moved simultaneously outwards and upwards from the longitudinal centre of the wagon. A further object of the invention is to minimize the number of actuating elements required for the sliding walls. To that end, when they pivot out of the closure plane into the displacement plane, the sliding wall parts can be raised obliquely upwards and outwards, guided at the top in fixed guides (4a, 22, 23) in the roof (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/00; B61D 17/08; B61D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/08 (2006.01); B61D 19/00 (2006.01); B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/003 (2013.01); B61D 17/08 (2013.01); B61D 19/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807606 A1 19980226; AT 199353 T 20010315; CZ 286047 B6 19991215; CZ 9801079 A3 19981111; DE 59606527 D1 20010405; DK 0855980 T3 20010326; EP 0855980 A1 19980805; EP 0855980 B1 20010228; GR 3035940 T3 20010831; HU 0002206 A2 20001128; HU 0002206 A3 20020128; HU 221115 B1 20020828; PT 855980 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150824

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150823

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150823

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 199353

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150823

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606527

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140823

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140807

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140902

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606527

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: OPPERMANN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GREENBRIER GERMANY G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050823

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-03-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060223

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-08-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-08-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2004-08-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040820

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Free Format Text: 20010228 *GREENBRIER GERMANY G.M.B.H.:STENEKESTRASSE 5, 31789 HAMELN

2001-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Free Format Text: 20010228 *GREENBRIER GERMANY G.M.B.H.

2001-07-24 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010724

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GREENBRIER GERMANY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GREENBRIER GERMANY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606527

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-03-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199353

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980415

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE