Global Patent Index - EP 0856006 A4

EP 0856006 A4 2001-12-12 - CYTOSTATIN II

Title (en)

CYTOSTATIN II

Title (de)

ZYTOSTATIN II

Title (fr)

CYTOSTATINE II

Publication

EP 0856006 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95935236 A

Priority

US 9512540 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711970A1] The invention relates to cytostatin II growth modulatory peptides, polynucleotides encoding the polypeptides, methods for producing the polypeptides, in particular by expressing the polynucleotides, and agonists and antagonists of the polypeptides. The invention further relates to methods for utilizing such polynucleotides, polypeptides, agonists and antagonists for applications which are related, in part, to research, diagnostic and clinical arts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C07K 14/475; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/79; C12P 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/475 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] SIEGENTHALER G ET AL: "PURIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF THE HUMAN EPIDERMAL FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEIN: LOCALIZATION DURING EPIDERMAL CELL DIFFERENTIATION IN VIVO AND IN VITRO", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 302, no. 2, 1 September 1994 (1994-09-01), pages 363 - 371, XP000645424, ISSN: 0264-6021
  • [Y] VEERKAMP J H ET AL: "STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL FEATURES OF DIFFERENT TYPES OF CYTOPLASMIC FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEINS", BBA - LIPIDS AND LIPID METABOLISM, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1081, no. 1, 4 January 1991 (1991-01-04), pages 1 - 24, XP000196446, ISSN: 0005-2760
  • [Y] VEERKAMP J H ET AL: "CYTOPLASMIC FATTY ACID-BINDING PROTEINS: THEIR STRUCTURE AND GENES", PROGRESS IN LIPID RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, PARIS, FR, vol. 34, no. 1, 1995, pages 17 - 52, XP000196433, ISSN: 0163-7827
  • See also references of WO 9711970A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711970 A1 19970403; AU 3733095 A 19970417; EP 0856006 A1 19980805; EP 0856006 A4 20011212; JP 2001507205 A 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050331

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/705 A, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12N 15/54 B, 7C 12N 15/79 B, 7C 12P 21/06 B, 7C 07K 14/475 B

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE