Global patent index - EP 0856074 B1

EP 0856074 B1 2000-01-19 - THREAD FEED DEVICE

Title (en)

THREAD FEED DEVICE

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LIVRAISON DU FIL

Publication

EP 0856074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934622 A

Priority

  • DE 19538449 A
  • EP 9604409 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6015109A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/04409 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 29, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 29, 1998 PCT Filed Oct. 10, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/14836 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 24, 1997In a yarn feeder, particularly for knitting machines, having a stationary housing and a rotational element which can be driven by a motor for winding on a yarn, and having a mechanical backturn-detent mechanism for the rotational element, which mechanism contains a detent member which is displaceable on a counter-member between a running position and a blocking position, in which blocking position the detent member engages at a braking surface. The detent member underlying a permanent drag power in each rotational direction which drag power is generated by means of friction contact in case of a rotational movement of the rotational element for displacing the detent member in dependence from the sense of rotation and in relation to the counter member either into the running position or into the blocking position. The counter-member and the detent member consist of ring bodies which are set within each other and which are rotatable in relation to each other about the rotational axis of the rotational element. The detent member co-operating with the braking surface in the braking position of the backturn-detent mechanism being provided at its periphery with a counter-braking surface range which is limited in a circumferential direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/482 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6015109 A 20000118; CN 1065933 C 20010516; CN 1200152 A 19981125; EP 0856074 A1 19980805; EP 0856074 B1 20000119; ES 2142621 T3 20000416; TW 475602 U 20020201

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2004-10-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021011

2001-10-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-10-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-10-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142621

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604253

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981113

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980327

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE