Global Patent Index - EP 0856099 B1

EP 0856099 B1 2000-06-28 - DUAL CONTROL LOOP SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

DUAL CONTROL LOOP SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT EINEM DOPPELTEN REGELUNGSKREIS FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDURE DE DOUBLE BOUCLE DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0856099 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96934935 A

Priority

  • FR 9601632 W
  • FR 9512237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714877A1] A system and a method for controlling the amount of fuel injected into an internal combustion engine fitted with a catalytic converter. The signal (KCL) output by a first feedback loop (16, 18, 20, 12) and derived from the output (Vup) of a first probe (16) upstream from the catalytic converter (14) is corrected in a corrector circuit (22) by a value (KRICH) determined in a circuit (24) on the basis of the output (Vdown) of a second probe (26) downstream from the catalytic converter (14). The system and method are useful in internal combustion injection engines fitted with a catalytic converter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714877 A1 19970424; DE 69609075 D1 20000803; DE 69609075 T2 20010308; EP 0856099 A1 19980805; EP 0856099 B1 20000628; FR 2740176 A1 19970425; FR 2740176 B1 19971128; JP 2000508036 A 20000627; JP 3734836 B2 20060111; KR 100419330 B1 20040417; US 6067794 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69609075

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609075 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980415

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT