Global Patent Index - EP 0856106 B1

EP 0856106 B1 2001-12-19 - A SUCTION MUFFLER FOR A HERMETIC COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

A SUCTION MUFFLER FOR A HERMETIC COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

SAUGSCHALLDÄMPFER FÜR EINEN HERMETISCHEN VERDICHTER

Title (fr)

SILENCIEUX A ASPIRATION POUR COMPRESSEUR HERMETIQUE

Publication

EP 0856106 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97937366 A

Priority

  • BR 9700042 W
  • BR 9604126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807987A1] A suction muffler for a hermetic compressor, comprising a hollow body (10) affixing a gas duct (20) which is defined by a gas inlet portion (21) having an inner end (21a) internal to said muffler body and an outer end (21b) external to said muffler body and in fluid communication with a suction inlet tube (8) provided in the hermetic shell (1) of the compressor, and a gas outlet portion (22) having an inner end (22a) internal to said muffler body and an outer end (22b) external to said muffler body and connected to a suction orifice, which is provided in the head (5) of a cylinder disposed inside the shell (1) and where is mounted the suction muffler, the extension of the gas duct (20) internal to the hollow body (10) being spaced from the walls thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0055 (2013.01); F04B 39/0072 (2013.01); Y10S 181/403 (2013.01); Y10S 417/902 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807987 A1 19980226; WO 9807987 A8 19990729; BR 9604126 A 19980526; CN 1109196 C 20030521; CN 1198802 A 19981111; DE 69709304 D1 20020131; DE 69709304 T2 20020814; EP 0856106 A1 19980805; EP 0856106 B1 20011219; JP 2001504189 A 20010327; JP 4012253 B2 20071121; US 5971720 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140820

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709304

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140820

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140820

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709304

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709304 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT