Global Patent Index - EP 0856123 B1

EP 0856123 B1 2003-06-11 - LAMP HOLDER FOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHTS

Title (en)

LAMP HOLDER FOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHTS

Title (de)

LAMPENHALTER EINES SCHEINWERFERS FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

PORTE-LAMPE D'UN PROJECTEUR POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0856123 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942862 A

Priority

  • DE 19632907 A
  • EP 9704457 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632907A1] A lamp holder has a ring (2) arranged on a reflector (3) for holding a lamp (1). The lamp is set on the holding ring in the direction of its longitudinal axis. A retaining ring (4) is set on the holding ring (2) and blocks the lamp (1) on the holding ring (2) in the direction of its longitudinal axis and in a radial direction with respect to the lamp axis. In order to block the lamp in the radial direction with respect to its axis on the holding ring, the retaining ring (4) has a bearing surface (5) inwardly oriented in the radial direction which presses the lamp (1) against a fixing surface (6) of the holding ring (2) which is inwardly oriented in the radial direction. The retaining ring (4) is supported on a radially oriented abutment surface (7) of the holding ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/194 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632907 A1 19980219; EP 0856123 A1 19980805; EP 0856123 B1 20030611; WO 9808021 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060808

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710264 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 19/00 A

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 19/00 A

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980414

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT