Global Patent Index - EP 0856126 B1

EP 0856126 B1 2000-02-23 - Method for Producing Gland Steam, and corresponding Steam Power Station

Title (en)

Method for Producing Gland Steam, and corresponding Steam Power Station

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Sperrdampf für eine Dampfturbine, sowie entsprechende Dampfkraftanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de vapeur de barrage blocage, et centrale thermique à vapeur correspondante

Publication

EP 0856126 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945485 A

Priority

  • DE 9601927 W
  • DE 19538674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19538674A1] To ensure reliable production of superheated steam from saturated steam using simple means, a first subsidiary stream t1 of the saturated steam is throttled before being superheated by heat exchange with a second subsidiary stream t2 of saturated steam. A steam turbine (2), when supplied with this superheated reserve steam (SD) taken from a steam collecting drum (24) of its water-steam circulation (34), is exposed to a particularly low corrosion risk even during start up following a night stoppage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22G 1/00; F01D 11/04; F01K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F01K 3/00 (2006.01); F22G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 3/002 (2013.01); F01D 11/04 (2013.01); F01D 25/007 (2013.01); F22G 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19538674 A1 19970424; EP 0856126 A2 19980805; EP 0856126 B1 20000223; ES 2143803 T3 20000516; IN 190405 B 20030727; MY 129600 A 20070430; TW 325513 B 19980121; US 6003317 A 19991221; WO 9714285 A2 19970424; WO 9714285 A3 19970703

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151009

2016-11-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161128

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151009

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604502

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141003

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141016

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141017

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-03-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143803 T3

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604502 20000330

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLAND STEAM, AND CORRESPONDING STEAM POWER STATION

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLAND STEAM, AND CORRESPONDING STEAM POWER STATION

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE