Global Patent Index - EP 0856127 B1

EP 0856127 B1 2001-12-12 - SPRING ASSISTED MULTI-NOZZLE DESUPERHEATER

Title (en)

SPRING ASSISTED MULTI-NOZZLE DESUPERHEATER

Title (de)

DAMPFKÜHLER MIT EINER UNTERSTÜTZUNGSFEDER UND MIT MEHREREN DÜSEN

Title (fr)

DESURCHAUFFEUR A PLUSIEURS INJECTEURS ASSISTE PAR UN RESSORT

Publication

EP 0856127 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96930579 A

Priority

US 9613620 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808025A1] A steam desuperheater has a body (38) extending into a steam line (16) and is operated by a controlled variable water pressure source responding to the amount of superheat in the steam line. As the pressure of the supply line is increased above a predetermined level greater than the steam pressure in the steam line (16), a piston (50) moves up against a calibrated spring (61) to progressively uncover a plurality of spray openings (73, 76) so that increasing water pressure results in an increasingly greater amount of water sprayed into the steam line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22G 5/123 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808025 A1 19980226; CA 2233546 A1 19980226; CA 2233546 C 20021224; DE 69617984 D1 20020124; DE 69617984 T2 20020912; EP 0856127 A1 19980805; EP 0856127 B1 20011212; ES 2171225 T3 20020901; JP 3872818 B2 20070124; KR 100400691 B1 20031231; KR 20000064291 A 20001106

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080823

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080823

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080822

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080823

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080822

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2004-04-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171225 T3

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617984 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL SIGNAL CORPORATION

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980331

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE