Global Patent Index - EP 0856138 B1

EP 0856138 B1 2002-11-27 - REFRIGERATOR DOOR

Title (en)

REFRIGERATOR DOOR

Title (de)

KÜHLSCHRANKTÜR

Title (fr)

PORTE DE REFRIGERATEUR

Publication

EP 0856138 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931817 A

Priority

  • DE 19633972 A
  • DE 19633973 A
  • DE 19633975 A
  • DE 19633976 A
  • DE 19633978 A
  • EP 9604108 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808036A1] The invention concerns a refrigerator door (10) with an outer covering (11) and a heat-insulating layer which is inserted between the outer covering (11) and an inner covering (12) disposed at a spacing therefrom. Disposed on the inner covering (12) are door storage compartments (25) for articles to be refrigerated. Provided on the inner covering (12) is a mounting grid (20) on which door storage compartments (25) provided with holder devices (29) are detachably mounted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/10 (2006.01); A47B 57/20 (2006.01); A47B 57/34 (2006.01); F25D 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/04 (2013.01); A47B 57/10 (2013.01); A47B 57/20 (2013.01); A47B 57/34 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808036 A1 19980226; DE 59609925 D1 20030109; DK 0856138 T3 20030224; EP 0856138 A1 19980805; EP 0856138 B1 20021127; EP 0856139 A1 19980805; ES 2187673 T3 20030616; WO 9808037 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100920

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100919

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609925

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100919

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100919

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040920

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187673 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609925 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980511

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE