Global Patent Index - EP 0856335 A3

EP 0856335 A3 2000-01-12 - Hard-shell golf bag

Title (en)

Hard-shell golf bag

Title (de)

Hartschalen-Golfbehälter

Title (fr)

Sac de golf en coquille dure

Publication

EP 0856335 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119913 A

Priority

US 79072497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856335A2] The golf bag consists of a closable hard shell container on which a trolley frame can be fixed. The container has an oblong base part, an oblong front part (13) and an upper lid (31). The front part and lid are hinged to fold out from the base part. The lid can have a handle (20) and be used to pull the bag and trolley. The container has several socket sleeves for the club shafts. A ball sleeve can also be incorporated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 55/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 55/08 (2006.01); A63B 55/00 (2006.01); A63B 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 55/60 (2015.10); A63B 55/20 (2015.10); A63B 55/406 (2015.10); Y10S 280/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856335 A2 19980805; EP 0856335 A3 20000112; CA 2225343 A1 19980731; US 5868247 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI