Global Patent Index - EP 0856337 B1

EP 0856337 B1 2003-06-18 - Safety binding on the topsurface of a skiboot

Title (en)

Safety binding on the topsurface of a skiboot

Title (de)

Sicherheitsbindung an der Oberseite des Skistiefels

Title (fr)

Fixation de sécurité à prise sur tige

Publication

EP 0856337 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810036 A

Priority

  • FR 9701235 A
  • FR 9703912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856337A1] The fastening consists of a clamp with two jaws (3, 4) in the form of first order levers which open outwards and close to engage with the edge of the boot sole. The jaws have lateral stops which press against the upper of the boot toe, and the clamp has additional front stops (12) to engage with the end of the boot sole, made in the form of rollers with vertical axes of rotation. The lateral stops are in the form of low-friction components and can also be rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/08 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01); A63C 9/084 (2006.01); A63C 9/085 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/001 (2013.01); A63C 9/08521 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856337 A1 19980805; EP 0856337 B1 20030618; AT 243052 T 20030715; DE 69815558 D1 20030724; DE 69815558 T2 20040429; JP H10211312 A 19980811; US 2002053784 A1 20020509; US 6889996 B2 20050510

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815558

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100122

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815558 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980626

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI