Global Patent Index - EP 0856360 B1

EP 0856360 B1 2002-09-04 - An inner scroll for an olive oil centrifugal separator

Title (en)

An inner scroll for an olive oil centrifugal separator

Title (de)

Polsterumwandlungsmaschine mit einer schwenkbaren Unterstützung für eine Materialrolle und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Vis pour séparateur centrifuge de l'huile d'olive

Publication

EP 0856360 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97121247 A

Priority

IT TO960990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856360A2] A rotating inner scroll (10) for a centrifugal separator with a horizontal axis for separating the liquid and solid phases from a past of crushed olives, comprises an elongated central hub (14) of substantially tubular shape and an outer drum of substantially truncated cone shape. The inner scroll comprises one or more baffles (20) oriented in an axial planes. The baffles are radially extending between the tubular hub (14) and the drum so as to form a barrier encompassing at least the boundary zone (A) between the oil and the water being separated by centrifugation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2013.01); B04B 2001/2041 (2013.01); B04B 2001/2058 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856360 A2 19980805; EP 0856360 A3 19990203; EP 0856360 B1 20020904; ES 2181975 T3 20030301; IT 1289718 B1 19981016; IT TO960990 A1 19980605

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110329

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181975 T3

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403953

2002-12-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT PT

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990803

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

1999-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-11-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT PT

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH ES FR GR IT LI

1999-10-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990803

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT PT

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI