Global Patent Index - EP 0856371 A3

EP 0856371 A3 2002-11-06 - Device for transferring axial impulses on a drill tool

Title (en)

Device for transferring axial impulses on a drill tool

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Uebertragung von impulsartigen axialen Schlägen auf ein Bohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert d'impulses axiaux sur un outil de forage

Publication

EP 0856371 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97810997 A

Priority

DE 19703334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856371A2] The effector comprises an adaptor housing (2), one end of which is releasably connects to the drill (3). The housing has rotary driver (7,9) connected to the drill's spindle (4). At the opposite end of the spindle is a tool accommodation (11), in which a drill bit (12) can be clamped. The rear end of the drill bit contacts an axially oscillating striker (15) activated by a mechanism (17-21) within the housing. The striker is coupled to the rotary driver to produce axial impulses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B23D 17/06 (2006.01); B25D 11/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/005 (2013.01); B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856371 A2 19980805; EP 0856371 A3 20021106; EP 0856371 B1 20061122; AT 345904 T 20061215; DE 59712767 D1 20070104; ES 2276417 T3 20070616; US 6089330 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161218

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161217

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 345904 T

- Effective date: 20161217

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712767

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2276417 T3

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712767 P 20070104

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIESCHER, STEFAN

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BINDER, GERHARD

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25D 17/00 A

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI