Global Patent Index - EP 0856467 B1

EP 0856467 B1 2002-11-27 - Method and device for joining and assembling container blanks and block-shaped article groups

Title (en)

Method and device for joining and assembling container blanks and block-shaped article groups

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenführen und Zusammenfügen von Schachtelzuschnitten und blockförmigen Artikelgruppen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour réunir et assembler des flancs de boîtes et des groupes d'articles parallélépipèiques

Publication

EP 0856467 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100687 A

Priority

DE 19703069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10258803A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a method and a device for guiding cut pieces for box- making together with block-like articles covered with interior materials and intermittently and parallelly arranged mutually and delivered to a joining position and joining them together. SOLUTION: A cut piece for box-making 1 of a material to be connected is folded at the periphery around articles, except the outward pasted side flaps 14, 21 forming closed parts of a package of the cut piece for box-making, at maximum three stop positions mutually connected in the transfer sections. A transfer means 22 for jointed materials is provided with folding stations S2-S4 for folding the cut pieces for box-making at maximum three positions as a whole except the folding of the side flaps 14, 21 connected to each other in the transfer sections F1-F3, in order to execute this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/20; B65B 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/20 (2006.01); B65B 5/02 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/223 (2013.01); B65B 5/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703069 A1 19980730; CN 1135187 C 20040121; CN 1194225 A 19980930; EP 0856467 A2 19980805; EP 0856467 A3 19990421; EP 0856467 B1 20021127; ES 2185067 T3 20030416; HK 1015330 A1 20041029; JP H10258803 A 19980929; US 6694703 B1 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050116

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050116

2005-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050116

2004-02-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185067 T3

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806381 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROSSMANN, JUERGEN

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLEY, FRANK

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GLOESMANN, JOSEF

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAECHTER, MICHAEL KLEINE

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991012

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI