Global patent index - EP 0856521 B1

EP 0856521 B1 2000-05-24 - Initiator composition for polymerising unsaturated monomers

Title (en)

Initiator composition for polymerising unsaturated monomers

Title (de)

Initiatorzusammensetzung für die Polymerisation von ungesättigten Monomeren

Title (fr)

Composition d'initiateur pour la polymérisation de monomères insaturés

Publication

EP 0856521 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101532 A

Priority

EP 97101532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856521A1] The description relates to an initiator composition for polymerising unsaturated monomers, containing a mixture component (A) of i) at least one salt of a metal in the second sub-group of the periodic system, optionally in solution in an aromatic solvent or in an alpha , beta -unsaturated ester, and ii) at least one salt of a metal in the seventh or eighth sub-group of the periodic system, optionally in solution in an aromatic solvent or in an alpha , beta -unsaturated ester, and at least one organic peroxy ester (component B> wherein the components (A) and (B) are spatially adjacent to one another. The description also relates to polymerisable compositions comprising the said initiator composition together with polymerisable unsaturated monomers. The initiator composition according to the invention can be used to homopolymerise and copolymerise all kinds of unsaturated monomers, such as methacrylic and acrylic acid esters, at lower temperatures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 4/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 2/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/40 (2006.01); C08F 18/04 (2006.01); C08F 20/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 4/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856521 A1 19980805; EP 0856521 B1 20000524; DE 69702112 D1 20000629; DE 69702112 T2 20000928; JP H10218919 A 19980818; US 6087458 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69702112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980922

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE