Global Patent Index - EP 0856640 B1

EP 0856640 B1 2001-12-12 - Sealing consisting of stacked strip sliding freely in a slot

Title (en)

Sealing consisting of stacked strip sliding freely in a slot

Title (de)

Dichtung bestehend aus in einem Schlitz gestapelten Gleitstreifen

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité à plaquettes empilées glissant dans des fentes de réception

Publication

EP 0856640 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400176 A

Priority

  • FR 9700988 A
  • US 695698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856640A1] The seal (7) is used for adjacent sectors (1) of a turbine stator and is designed to span a gap (6) between the sectors. The seal consists of a series of flexible plates (10) which are set one on top of another and are able to slide relative to one another in slots (8) in the facing surfaces of the two sectors. The two sectors linked by the seal are angular sectors which are fitted separately on a stator housing and control gas flow. Leakage is prevented due to movement of flexible plates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/00; F01D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F01D 9/04 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/005 (2013.01); F01D 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856640 A1 19980805; EP 0856640 B1 20011212; CA 2228777 A1 19980730; CA 2228777 C 20050920; FR 2758856 A1 19980731; FR 2758856 B1 19990226; JP 3808197 B2 20060809; JP H10212904 A 19980811; US 5997247 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802848 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA MOTEURS

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

1999-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980210

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI