Global Patent Index - EP 0856653 B1

EP 0856653 B1 2001-05-09 - Electronic system for calculating mixture strength

Title (en)

Electronic system for calculating mixture strength

Title (de)

Elektronisches Berechnungssystem der Gemischzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Système électronique pour calculer la richesse du mélange

Publication

EP 0856653 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98105227 A

Priority

  • EP 94117678 A
  • IT TO930857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657637A2] System for calculating mixture strength in which an electronic panel (7) is capable of comparing the voltage generated by exhaust gas sensors, in particular from a lambda probe (19) located in the exhaust manifold (21) of a petrol engine (4), with a threshold value (Str) such as to distinguish between a first and a second state (rich state/lean state), corresponding to an air/petrol mixture supplied to the engine which contains more or less petrol, respectively, than is required by the stoichiometric ratio. The system enables this threshold to be updated periodically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1495 (2013.01); F02D 41/1474 (2013.01); F02D 41/1479 (2013.01); F02D 41/148 (2013.01); F02D 41/2454 (2013.01); F02D 41/2474 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657637 A2 19950614; EP 0657637 A3 19951011; EP 0657637 B1 19981007; BR 9404572 A 19951024; DE 69413784 D1 19981112; DE 69413784 T2 19990225; DE 69427199 D1 20010613; DE 69427199 T2 20011018; DE 69430017 D1 20020404; DE 69430017 T2 20020814; EP 0855498 A2 19980729; EP 0855498 A3 19980826; EP 0855498 B1 20020227; EP 0856653 A2 19980805; EP 0856653 A3 19980826; EP 0856653 B1 20010509; ES 2125389 T3 19990301; ES 2158630 T3 20010901; ES 2172836 T3 20021001; IT 1261114 B 19960509; IT TO930857 A1 19950513; IT TO930857 D0 19931112

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091110

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091110

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158630 T3

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427199 20010613

2001-05-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 657637

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000127

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980731

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1998-08-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 657637

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE