Global Patent Index - EP 0856710 A3

EP 0856710 A3 2001-12-05 - Ventilation apparatus

Title (en)

Ventilation apparatus

Title (de)

Lüftungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de ventilation

Publication

EP 0856710 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300695 A

Priority

GB 9702201 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856710A2] The invention relates to ventilation apparatus 1 for providing flow of gas, in the embodiment air, from one side 'I' of a closure, such as a window 2, to the other side 'E', the apparatus comprising a body 3, suitably of extruded plastic, defining a passage 4 for flow of the air, and a filter element adapted to obturate flow of foreign bodies through the passage 4, from an outlet 7 to an inlet 6. The filter element is a plastic gauge element which is bent in the embodiment to a U-shape and sprung into place in an intermediate chamber 14 of the body. Other embodiments of filter element are described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/18; E06B 7/06; E06B 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/06 (2006.01); E06B 7/10 (2006.01); F24F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 7/06 (2013.01); F24F 13/18 (2013.01); E06B 7/02 (2013.01); E06B 2007/145 (2013.01); F24F 3/1603 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856710 A2 19980805; EP 0856710 A3 20011205; GB 9702201 D0 19970326

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040119

2002-10-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020530

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: POLYPIPE BUILDING PRODUCTS LTD.

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/18 A, 7E 06B 7/06 B, 7E 06B 7/10 B

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI