Global Patent Index - EP 0856781 A3

EP 0856781 A3 2000-05-24 - Developing unit

Title (en)

Developing unit

Title (de)

Entwicklungseinheit

Title (fr)

Unité de développement

Publication

EP 0856781 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300703 A

Priority

  • JP 3267897 A
  • JP 4645897 A
  • JP 4645997 A
  • JP 4646097 A
  • JP 4646797 A
  • JP 4646897 A
  • JP 4646997 A
  • JP 4647097 A
  • JP 4647197 A
  • JP 4647297 A
  • JP 4647397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856781A2] A developing unit of the present invention includes a case which accommodates toner containing pigment, a developing roller, a supply roller having chamfered ends and formed of an elastic member arranged to be pressed against a surface of the developing roller in such a manner as to supply toner to the surface of the developing roller. Moreover, the ratio or open cells in the elastic supply roller is made to be 30% or higher and depth of engagement of the supply roller to the developing roller is made to be 0.4 mm or smaller. Also a first sealing member is disposed on the side ends of the developing roller and supply roller so as to prevent leakage to the outside portion of the case. The side surfaces of the developing roller have a surface roughness of 0.5 mu m or smaller in Rmax. Further, a second sealing member in the form of a film is pressed against a lower surface of the developing roller in order to prevent leakage of toner, wherein a quantity 6 of displacement of the sealing member due to its abutment against the developing roller satisfies 0.1 mm < delta < 0.8 mm, and the thickness t of the second sealing member satisfies 50 mu m < t < 500 mu m. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0126 (2013.01); G03G 15/0806 (2013.01); G03G 15/0808 (2013.01); G03G 15/0812 (2013.01); G03G 15/0817 (2013.01); G03G 15/0818 (2013.01); G03G 15/0822 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0861 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 191 (P - 1038) 18 April 1990 (1990-04-18)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 499 (P - 807) 27 December 1988 (1988-12-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 10 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856781 A2 19980805; EP 0856781 A3 20000524; EP 0856781 B1 20040811; DE 69825505 D1 20040916; DE 69825505 T2 20050120; DE 69825505 T8 20050504; EP 1324150 A2 20030702; EP 1324150 A3 20041208; EP 1324151 A2 20030702; EP 1324151 A3 20041208; EP 1324151 B1 20080220; US 2001005461 A1 20010628; US 6094554 A 20000725; US 6151474 A 20001121; US 6163674 A 20001219; US 6192209 B1 20010220; US 6198893 B1 20010306; US 6226484 B1 20010501; US 6295433 B1 20010925; US 6336022 B2 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090130

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090130

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69825505

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021025

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB