Global Patent Index - EP 0856828 A3

EP 0856828 A3 2000-01-05 - Alarm system

Title (en)

Alarm system

Title (de)

Alarmsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'alarme

Publication

EP 0856828 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300392 A

Priority

GB 9701941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0856828A2] A fire alarm system comprises control panel 13, first and second two-wire alarm circuits 17,18 extending from the control panel 13 into respective zones, each alarm circuit comprising a plurality of combined detector and sounder devices 10 connected in parallel across the wires 11,12 of the circuit. Upon detection of smoke or heat in one of the zones, the activated device 10 is arranged to draw a pulsed current from the control panel 13, which can be detected to trigger an alarm condition in the control panel 13, whereupon the control panel 13 applies an alarm signal circuit to the alarm circuits 17,18 of both zones, so as to energise the sounders of all devices 10. The pulsed current that is drawn by the devices 10 when they are activated by heat or smoke means that any further change in current that is caused when more devices 10 are activated as the fire spreads will be detected by the control panel 13, despite the heavy current being drawn by the energised sounders. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0856828 A2 19980805; EP 0856828 A3 20000105; EP 0856828 B1 20040303; DE 69822010 D1 20040408; GB 2321747 A 19980805; GB 2321747 B 20001018; GB 9701941 D0 19970319

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-11-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822010 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IE IT NL

2004-03-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAFIKI HOLDINGS LIMITED

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021002

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IE IT NL

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE IE IT NL

1998-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI