Global patent index - EP 0857030 B1

EP 0857030 B1 2001-04-18 - LIQUID DISPENSER

Title (en)

LIQUID DISPENSER

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDER

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0857030 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96934648 A

Priority

  • EP 96934648 A
  • EP 9604435 W
  • EP 95202859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715223A1] There is provided a dispenser for delivering aliquots of a liquid product comprising a housing (1) and a disposable refill package which is positioned inside the housing (1) and comprises a collapsible reservoir (2) for the liquid product fitted with a bellow pump (3), whereby the bellow pump (3) comprises a product inlet valve (4) and a product outlet valve (5) and is manually operable via indirect actuating means (10, 11), and whereby the housing (1) is provided with a narrow opening (9) into which a correspondingly shaped portion of the bellow pump (3) located near the outlet valve (5) thereof, can be detachably secured, characterised in that the bellow pump (3) is equipped with a discharge tube (8) having an internal flow channel of which the diameter at the outlet is at least 1.2 times larger than at the inlet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715223 A1 19970501; AU 721392 B2 20000629; AU 7291196 A 19970515; BR 9611167 A 19990330; CA 2233141 A1 19970501; CA 2233141 C 20020205; DE 69612562 D1 20010523; DE 69612562 T2 20010809; EP 0857030 A1 19980812; EP 0857030 B1 20010418; ES 2158353 T3 20010901; ZA 9608829 B 19980421

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161010

2016-10-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69612562

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141012

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141011

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DIVERSEY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-04-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158353

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612562

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990614

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980311

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT