Global Patent Index - EP 0857147 B1

EP 0857147 B1 2000-01-26 - PLASTIC HOODED LID WITH THIN CENTRAL REGION

Title (en)

PLASTIC HOODED LID WITH THIN CENTRAL REGION

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFF-STÜLPDECKEL MIT DÜNNEM SPIEGELBEREICH

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE CLOCHE EN PLASTIQUE COMPORTANT UNE FINE ZONE CENTRALE

Publication

EP 0857147 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945834 A

Priority

  • DE 9602042 W
  • DE 19540152 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19540152A1] Proposed is a plastic hooded lid (1) used for sealing a container and comprising a lid central portion (7) and a contoured (3, 4) edge region (2) for positive and/or non-positive engagement with the matching container edge. The edge region (2) has a wall thickness sufficient to ensure that the lid is held firmly on the container. The lid central portion (7) is made from a different material and/or a material of considerably less thickness (d2) and rigidity. This ensure that considerably less material can be used during manufacture without compromising the required regidity of the edge region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0024 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00805 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00842 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19540152 A1 19970430; DE 19540152 C2 19970904; AT 189171 T 20000215; EP 0857147 A1 19980812; EP 0857147 B1 20000126; PL 326392 A1 19980914; WO 9715506 A2 19970501; WO 9715506 A3 19970619

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161024

2016-11-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161024

2016-10-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161024

2016-10-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604328

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RPC CONTAINERS LTD

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011008

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-11 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI LU MC NL SE

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604328 20000302

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI LU MC NL SE

2000-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189171 T 20000215

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-08-26 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

1998-08-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LU MC NL SE

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LU MC NL SE