Global Patent Index - EP 0857242 B1

EP 0857242 B1 2001-12-19 - HORIZONTAL-FLOW OIL-SEALANT-PRESERVING DRAIN ODOR TRAP

Title (en)

HORIZONTAL-FLOW OIL-SEALANT-PRESERVING DRAIN ODOR TRAP

Title (de)

ABFLUSS MIT GERUCHSSTOP MIT ÖLDICHTUNGSMITTELERHALTENDER HORIZONTALFLUSSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

PIEGE A ODEURS POUR CONDUITS D'EVACUATION, A ECOULEMENT HORIZONTAL, PRESERVANT L'HUILE D'ETANCHEITE

Publication

EP 0857242 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96936998 A

Priority

  • US 9617187 W
  • US 54828195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715735A1] Improvements in retention of the oily liquid sealant (20) in an oil-sealed odor trap (10B), for drain applications such as a waterless urinal or anti-evaporation floor drain, are accomplished by making the liquid flow path (22A, 22B) substantially horizontal as a departure from conventional practice of substantially vertical flow. The trap (10B) is structured to realize the substantially horizontal liquid flow path (22A, 22B) and to locate the flow path immediately beneath the sealant layer (20) or beneath a baffle portion (16B) that is sloped such that stray sealant droplets migrating upwardly to the upper surface of the flow path due to their buoyancy will be recaptured and returned to the main sealant layer (20). To accomplish substantially horizontal flow (22A, 22B), the entry compartment can be made to have entry (16D) and exit openings substantially offset from each other. The baffle between the entry compartment and the discharge compartment, which has traditionally been made entirely vertical, is made to have a non-vertical portion (16B) that is preferably sloped for sealant recovery. A sealant sheltering region can be provided in the vicinity of the entry region to prevent catastrophic loss of sealant in the event of high pressure water flushing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 13/00 (2006.01); E03C 1/28 (2006.01); E03D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/281 (2013.01); E03C 1/28 (2013.01); E03D 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715735 A1 19970501; AT 211207 T 20020115; AU 699494 B2 19981203; AU 7477296 A 19970515; BR 9610879 A 19991221; CA 2236005 A1 19970501; CA 2236005 C 20020108; CN 1141468 C 20040310; CN 1200160 A 19981125; DE 69618225 D1 20020131; DE 69618225 T2 20020613; DK 0857242 T3 20020114; DK 9900216 U3 19991022; EP 0857242 A1 19980812; EP 0857242 B1 20011219; EP 0857242 B2 20160713; EP 1176261 A1 20020130; ES 2170281 T3 20020801; HK 1017038 A1 20041231; IL 124063 A 20010724; JP 3515785 B2 20040405; JP H11515068 A 19991221; MX 9803276 A 19981130; MY 118779 A 20050131; NO 981697 A 19980622; NO 981697 D0 19980416; NZ 321439 A 19991028; PL 182461 B1 20020131; PL 326383 A1 19980914; PT 857242 E 20020628

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151026

2017-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150505

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161014

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160713

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151026

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-07-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-07-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20160713

2016-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2016-07-13 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69618225

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69618225

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-06-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020401082

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211207 T

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-05-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-05-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-05-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E03D 13/00 20060101AFI20141204BHEP

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, LOS ANGELE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, LOS ANGELES, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 69618225

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-10-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-10-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

2014-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, US

- Document: AT 211207 T

- Effective date: 20130920

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GORGES, DITMAR L., BRENTWOOD, US

- Document: DE 69618225

- Effective date: 20130130

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, LOS ANGELES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GORGES, DITMAR L., BRENTWOOD, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 69618225

- Effective date: 20130130

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, LOS ANGELE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GORGES, DITMAR L., BRENTWOOD, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 69618225

- Effective date: 20130130

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

- Effective date: 20130130

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

- Effective date: 20121203

2013-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: 2255 BARRY AVE.,LOS ANGELES CA 90024

- Effective date: 20130207

2013-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES

- Effective date: 20130207

2013-02-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130124 AND 20130130

2013-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

2013-01-25 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121227

2013-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, US

- Effective date: 20121227

2013-01-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES

2013-01-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: GORGES, DITMAR L.

2012-12-04 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FALCON WATERFREE TECHNOLOGIES, US

- Effective date: 20121123

2012-12-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69618225

- Representative's name: WALLINGER RICKER SCHLOTTER TOSTMANN PATENT- UN, DE

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GORGES, DITMAR L.

- Free text: GORGES, DITMAR L.#NO. 401 11660 MAYFIELD AVENUE#BRENTWOOD, CA 90049 (US) -TRANSFER TO- GORGES, DITMAR L.#NO. 401 11660 MAYFIELD AVENUE#BRENTWOOD, CA 90049 (US)

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2004-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2004-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-10-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-10-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-09-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2004-09-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: JOHN REESE

2003-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: JOHN REESE

2003-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: JOHN REESE

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-04-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-04-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2003-04-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JOHN REESE

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IFOE SANITAER AB

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: URIDAN A/S

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170281 T3

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401082

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618225 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211207 T 20020115

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980424

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE