Global patent index - EP 0857313 A4

EP 0857313 A4 2000-04-12 - DISPERSION COMPENSATING SINGLE MODE WAVEGUIDE

Title (en)

DISPERSION COMPENSATING SINGLE MODE WAVEGUIDE

Title (de)

DISPERSIONSKOMPENSIERTER MONOMODIGER WELLENLEITER

Title (fr)

GUIDE D'ONDES UNIMODAL A COMPENSATION DE LA DISPERSION

Publication

EP 0857313 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97934929 A

Priority

  • US 9712136 W
  • US 2329796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804941A1] A dispersion compensating single mode optical waveguide fiber designed to change the wavelength window of operation of a link from 1301 nm to 1550 nm. The dispersion compensating waveguide fiber is characterized by a core glass region refractive index profile comprised of at least three segments (2, 4, 6, 8). The segment (2) on the waveguide center has a positive relative refractive index. At least one segment (4, 8), spaced apart from the waveguide centerline has a negative relative refractive index.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/22; G02B 6/16; H04B 10/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02 (2006.01); C03B 37/023 (2006.01); G02B 6/036 (2006.01); H04B 10/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/03666 (2013.01); G02B 6/02261 (2013.01); G02B 6/03661 (2013.01); G02B 6/02004 (2013.01); G02B 6/0228 (2013.01); G02B 6/0286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] EP 0598554 A1 19940525 - AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]
  • [DY] US 5361319 A 19941101 - ANTOS A JOSEPH [US], et al
  • [AD] US 4715679 A 19871229 - BHAGAVATULA VENKATA A [US]
  • [A] EP 0674193 A2 19950927 - SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]
  • [A] US 5261016 A 19931109 - POOLE CRAIG D [US]
  • [Y] GB 2138429 A 19841024 - STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD
  • [A] US 4778244 A 19881018 - RYAN TIMOTHY G [GB]
  • [Y] KAKUI M ET AL: "2.4-GBIT/S, 306-KM REPEATERLESS TRANSMISSION BY USING A DIRECTLY MODULATED DFB-LD AND DISPERSION-COMPENSATING FIBER", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION. SUMMARIES OF PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE CONFERENCE OFC '95, SAN DIEGO, FEB. 26 - MAR. 3, 1995, 26 February 1995 (1995-02-26), INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, pages 148/149, XP000517681, ISBN: 0-7803-2654-7
  • [YA] SEMENOV V A ET AL: "BROADBAND DISPERSION-COMPENSATING FIBER FOR HIGH-BIT-RATE TRANSMISSION NETWORK USE", APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 34, no. 24, 20 August 1995 (1995-08-20), pages 5331 - 5337, XP000518210, ISSN: 0003-6935
  • [Y] TKACH R W ET AL: "TRANSMISSION OF EIGHT 20-GB/S CHANNELS OVER 232 KM OF CONVENTIONAL SINGLE-MODE FIBER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, vol. 7, no. 11, 1 November 1995 (1995-11-01), pages 1369 - 1371, XP000537980, ISSN: 1041-1135
  • See also references of WO 9804941A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804941 A1 19980205; AU 3798397 A 19980220; AU 714957 B2 20000113; BR 9706588 A 19990720; CA 2221737 A1 19980131; CN 1100273 C 20030129; CN 1198219 A 19981104; EP 0857313 A1 19980812; EP 0857313 A4 20000412; JP 2002090568 A 20020327; JP 3267302 B2 20020318; JP H11507445 A 19990629; KR 100443213 B1 20041103; RU 2171484 C2 20010727; TW 445384 B 20010711

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061012

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6G 02B 6/22 A, 6G 02B 6/16 B, 6H 04B 10/18 B

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980311

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE