Global Patent Index - EP 0857322 B1

EP 0857322 B1 2001-01-17 - METHOD OF OPERATING AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER USING DIFFERENT FORM LENGTHS

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPERATING AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER USING DIFFERENT FORM LENGTHS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ELEKTROGRAFISCHEN DRUCKERS BEI VERWENDUNG UNTERSCHIEDLICHER FORMULARLÄNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE IMPRIMANTE ELECTROGRAPHIQUE POUR L'UTILISATION DE FORMULAIRES DE DIFFERENTES LONGUEURS

Publication

EP 0857322 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96920777 A

Priority

  • EP 96920777 A
  • EP 9602397 W
  • EP 95116972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716767A1] The disclosure relates to a method of operating an electrographic printer. A first web section (A) of a web (10) of continuous medium which can be folded in sheets with predetermined form lengths is led past the transfer printing stations (22) of an intermediate image carrier (26). The web (10) is then transported through the printer and offset and optionally also reversed, thus ensuring that an offset second web section (B) is led in one plane next to and with the first web section (A) past the transfer printing station (22) of the intermediate image carrier (26). For form lengths FL1 = (k x 1/2 + 1/6) x LE or FL2 = (k x 1/2 + 2/6) x LE, k being a real integer, the length L of the web (10) from one transfer printing station (22) to another is set to ensure that the quotient n1/3 or n2/3 gives a remainder R = 0, n1 being the rounded up integer value from L/FL1 and n2 the rounded up integer value from L/FL2. This ensures that the adjacent web sections (A, B) are printed on the correct side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6526 (2013.01); G03G 15/231 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00459 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00924 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716767 A1 19970509; DE 59606350 D1 20010222; EP 0857322 A1 19980812; EP 0857322 B1 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606350

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130630

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606350 20010222

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000608

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980522

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR