Global Patent Index - EP 0857323 B1

EP 0857323 B1 2001-04-25 - METHOD OF OPERATING AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY PRINTING TWO ADJACENT WEB SECTIONS OF A WEB

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPERATING AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY PRINTING TWO ADJACENT WEB SECTIONS OF A WEB

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ELEKTROGRAFISCHEN DRUCKERS FÜR DEN GLEICHZEITIGEN DRUCK ZWEIER NEBENEINANDERLIEGENDER BAHNABSCHNITTE EINER BAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE IMPRIMANTE ELECTROGRAPHIQUE POUR L'IMPRESSION SIMULTANEE DE DEUX SECTIONS ADJACENTES D'UNE BANDE

Publication

EP 0857323 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922881 A

Priority

  • EP 96922881 A
  • EP 9602713 W
  • EP 95116971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716768A1] A method of operating an electrographic printer is disclosed. According to this method, a first web section (A) of a web (10) is aligned with its leading edge or a fold (12, 14) along an insert mark (MEA) when a continuous carrier material is inserted into the printer. The web (10) is then transported through the printer and thus offset and optionally reversed, so that an offset second web section (B) in one plane is led with and next to the first web section (A) past a transfer printing station (22) of a printing unit (24). The second web section (B) is similarly aligned with its leading edge or a fold (12, 14) along the insert mark (MEB). The printing operation is then started, pressure being applied simultaneously to both web sections (A, B) of the web (10). Transport of the first and second web sections (A, B) is effected by a transport device (20) near the printing unit (24) and provided with transport means (44, 46) which engage with both web sections (A, B) and move during printing at least approximately the same speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/20 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6526 (2013.01); B65H 20/20 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00459 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00924 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716768 A1 19970509; DE 59606829 D1 20010531; EP 0857323 A1 19980812; EP 0857323 B1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606829

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130630

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606829 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000825

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980526

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR