Global patent index - EP 0857360 B1

EP 0857360 B1 2000-01-12 - CONTACT ELEMENT WITH CRIMP SECTION

Title (en)

CONTACT ELEMENT WITH CRIMP SECTION

Title (de)

KONTAKTELEMENT MIT CRIMPABSCHNITT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONTACT AVEC SECTION A SERTIR

Publication

EP 0857360 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934416 A

Priority

  • DE 9601684 W
  • DE 19540327 A
  • DE 19549174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716867A1] In order to keep low the risk of breaking the conductor (1) when joining a contact element to a conductor (1) by crimping and nevertheless ensure a good current and heat conductivity, resistance to traction and long service life of the connection, deformations which form grooves (2) or ribs inclined at an angle to the longitudinal axis of the conductor (1) are provided at the inner surface of the crimp section (6) which contacts the conductor (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/188 (2013.01); H01R 13/115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716867 A1 19970509; BR 9611288 A 19990126; EP 0857360 A1 19980812; EP 0857360 B1 20000112; HU 9900742 A2 19990728; HU 9900742 A3 20000128; JP H11515137 A 19991221; US 6056605 A 20000502

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT