Global Patent Index - EP 0857522 B1

EP 0857522 B1 2002-11-27 - Rolling mill

Title (en)

Rolling mill

Title (de)

Walzstrasse

Title (fr)

Train de laminage

Publication

EP 0857522 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100361 A

Priority

DE 19701235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857522A1] The rolling section, in particular, a tandem roll stand group, consists of three roll stands (in particular, two universal roll stands and an upsetting roll stand between them) with guide sets, an operator-side shunting stage (11) and a changing trolley for roll changing operations. The guide sets (20) are joined to the roll sets (12) and, as single units, are movable out of the rolling line together with the operator-side roll support structures (2a, 3a, 4a) of the three roll stands (2, 3, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 39/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/12 (2006.01); B21B 13/12 (2006.01); B21B 31/10 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 39/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/12 (2013.01); B21B 31/10 (2013.01); B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 39/16 (2013.01); B21B 2031/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19701235 A1 19980723; AT 228402 T 20021215; EP 0857522 A1 19980812; EP 0857522 B1 20021127; JP 4468492 B2 20100526; JP H10272504 A 19981013; US 5941115 A 19990824

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 228402 T

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-01-31 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180111

2018-01-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806383

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59806383

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806383

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2013-12-24 [REG DE R206] AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: DE 59806383

- Effective date: 20131224

2013-10-24 [REG DE R043] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN PART NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59806383

- Effective date: 20130528

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806383 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228402 T 20021215

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020225

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

1999-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1999-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980127

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI