Global Patent Index - EP 0857524 A3

EP 0857524 A3 2001-03-21 - Wire-bundle former

Title (en)

Wire-bundle former

Title (de)

Drahtbund-Bildestation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour former bobines de fil

Publication

EP 0857524 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101722 A

Priority

DE 19704423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857524A2] Each of the station's mandrels (3,4) has a U-profile which is open towards the shaft axis, and its free end has support (20) for a cap. The cap, by the diameter of its body which protrudes beyond the approximate square cross section of a mandrel with a radial gap on all sides, determines the internal diameter of the wire coil. The profile of each mandrel is selected so that a lifting of the coil from the mandrel by a hook() can be carried out without the product coming into contact with the mandrel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/242 (2013.01); B21C 47/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857524 A2 19980812; EP 0857524 A3 20010321; DE 19704423 A1 19980813; US 5967439 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030628

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI