Global Patent Index - EP 0857552 A3

EP 0857552 A3 2000-02-09 - Stone cutting element with increased wear resistance

Title (en)

Stone cutting element with increased wear resistance

Title (de)

Steinbearbeitungswerkzeug mit verbessertem Anschnittverhalten

Title (fr)

Elément pour couper de la pierre ayant une résistance accrue à l'usure

Publication

EP 0857552 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98200161 A

Priority

AT 10997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857552A2] In a stone working (e.g. core drilling) tool with multilayer abrasive elements consisting of sintered metal-bonded cutting material, preferably diamond, each abrasive element (1) has a leading initial cutting zone (3) with a different composition and increased wear compared with the regular portion (4) of the element. Preferably, the initial cutting zone (3) contains a wear promoting filler selected from tungsten disulphide, tungsten carbide, molybdenum disulphide, lime, corundum, silicon carbide, carbon particles, glass, ceramic and pore formers. It contains more fragile and easily worn diamond particles, has a lower concentration of diamond particles and/or has a binder with lower hardness and/or wear resistance, compared with the regular portion (4) of the abrasive element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/12; B24D 3/34; B28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 7/14 (2006.01); B28D 1/04 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 7/14 (2013.01); B24D 3/34 (2013.01); B28D 1/041 (2013.01); B28D 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857552 A2 19980812; EP 0857552 A3 20000209; EP 0857552 B1 20001025; AT 197133 T 20001115; DE 59800309 D1 20001130; ES 2154072 T3 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197133 T

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800309

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140123

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140122

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140122

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154072 T3

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800309 20001130

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197133 T 20001115

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STONE MACHINING TOOL WITH IMPROVED FIRST CUT BEHAVIOR

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI