Global Patent Index - EP 0857646 A3

EP 0857646 A3 2000-04-19 - Panel structure for cabin walls, in particular for ships or the like, and relevant manufacturing method

Title (en)

Panel structure for cabin walls, in particular for ships or the like, and relevant manufacturing method

Title (de)

Paneelstruktur für Kabinenwände, insbesondere für Schiffe, und entsprechendes Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Structure de panneau pour paroi de cabine, notamment pour bateau, et sa méthode de production

Publication

EP 0857646 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97118162 A

Priority

GB 9702339 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857646A2] A panel structure for cabin walls, in particular for ships or the like, of the kind comprising a slab (1) made of a material apt to be finished to obtain the visible part of the wall, and stiffening frame made of metal sections (2) applied to said slab (1), wherein said sections (2)are made of two main bodies (7, 8) having a polygonal shape and connected to the slab by a flexible thin metal strip (13), said strip having a weakening (14) line that allows the bending of the section to obtain the corner of the wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 3/68; B63B 29/02; E04B 2/74; E04C 2/38; E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857646 A2 19980812; EP 0857646 A3 20000419; CN 1061306 C 20010131; CN 1191193 A 19980826; GB 2321911 A 19980812; GB 2321911 B 20001213; GB 9702339 D0 19970326; IT 1296215 B1 19990618; IT PC970007 A1 19981021; IT PC970007 D0 19970421; TW 384264 B 20000311

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020725

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 3/68 A, 7B 63B 29/02 B, 7E 04B 2/74 B, 7E 04C 2/38 B, 7E 04F 13/08 B

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI