Global patent index - EP 0857674 A3

EP 0857674 A3 2000-03-29 - Apparatus for forming a stream of uniformly overlapped printed products

Title (en)

Apparatus for forming a stream of uniformly overlapped printed products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bildung eines Stroms von Druckprodukten in gleichmässiger Schuppenformation

Title (fr)

Appareil pour former un courant de produits imprimés se chevauchant uniformement

Publication

EP 0857674 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98102100 A

Priority

  • US 95029197 A
  • US 79877597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857674A2] A conveying apparatus has a receiving surface for a stack of printed products lying above one another, with a conveying device adjoining the receiving surface. A vacuum roll rotatable in the conveying direction can act by means of a reduced pressure on the lower side of the printed product in order to produce the desired overlap. The upper tangential plane of the vacuum roll thereby forms a part of the receiving surface. The apparatus herein generates a stream of overlapping signatures with the overlap between adjacent signatures in the stream being uniform. Such uniform overlap generally corresponds to the distance from the upstream end of the receiving surface or signature support portion of the apparatus to the vacuum roll, and more specifically to the upstream edge of a transverse manifold slot provided in the roll. Overlapped signatures are fed by the roll to a downstream nip and blower assembly for being pulled through the nip thereof. The nip is shiftably mounted so as to adjust the size of nip space during running of the apparatus to accommodate for changing thickness of the signature material drawn through the self-adjusting nip at any one time, such as due to varying numbers of signatures being in the nip space or when thicker folded over spines are therein. The precise location at which air from the blowers is directed back upstream against the signatures can be fine tuned and preset as determined by the thickness of the signatures to be run. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/24; B65H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/10 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857674 A2 19980812; EP 0857674 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 3/10 A

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17D

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI