Global Patent Index - EP 0857776 B1

EP 0857776 B1 2002-09-11 - Mineral oil and mineral oil distillate flowability improvement using alkylphenol-aldehyde resins

Title (en)

Mineral oil and mineral oil distillate flowability improvement using alkylphenol-aldehyde resins

Title (de)

Verbesserung der Fliessfähigkeit von Mineralölen und Mineralöldestillaten unter Verwendung von Alkylphenol-Aldehydharzen

Title (fr)

Amélioration de la fluidité d'huiles minérales et de distillates d'huiles minérales par l'utilisation de résines alkylphénol-aldéhyde

Publication

EP 0857776 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122900 A

Priority

  • DE 19700159 A
  • DE 19739272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857776A1] Process for improving the flowability of paraffin-containing mineral oil (distillates) comprises reacting them with (A) ethylene/vinyl ester co- or ter-polymer, (B) alkyl phenol-aldehyde resin containing 10% alkyl phenols and more than one alkyl groups, and opt. (C) a paraffin dispersant different from B. A mixture containing (B) and (C) and a mixture containing (A), (B), and (C) are also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/14; C10L 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/182 (2006.01); C10L 1/192 (2006.01); C10L 1/197 (2006.01); C10L 1/198 (2006.01); C10L 10/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/14 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/18 (2013.01); C10L 1/1608 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C10L 1/1966 (2013.01); C10L 1/1973 (2013.01); C10L 1/1981 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/221 (2013.01); C10L 1/2222 (2013.01); C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01); C10L 1/2364 (2013.01); C10L 1/2368 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857776 A1 19980812; EP 0857776 B1 20020911; EP 0857776 B2 20070502; AT 223953 T 20020915; CA 2226278 A1 19980707; CA 2226278 C 20061024; ES 2183073 T3 20030316; ES 2183073 T5 20071016; JP 4132167 B2 20080813; JP H10245575 A 19980914; NO 980064 A 19980708; NO 980064 D0 19980106; US 5998530 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171223

2018-02-19 [REG BE MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171224

2018-01-30 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171223

2017-12-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171223

2017-12-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708189

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141225

2016-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160128

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141224

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223953 T

- Effective date: 20141224

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2007-10-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-08-08 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-05-22 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN AMENDED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2006-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: INFINEUM UK LTD.

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INFINEUM UK LTD.

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183073 T3

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708189 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223953 T 20020915

2002-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MINERAL OIL AND MINERAL OIL DISTILLATE FLOWABILITY IMPROVEMENT USING ALKYLPHENOL-ALDEHYDE RESINS

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

1999-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990212

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI