Global Patent Index - EP 0857800 A3

EP 0857800 A3 2000-03-15 - Method for manufacturing a garment provided with arms on a double bed flat knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a garment provided with arms on a double bed flat knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit Ärmeln versehenen Kleidungsstücks auf einer Zweibett-Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une pièce de vêtement pourvue de bras dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne à deux fontures

Publication

EP 0857800 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100579 A

Priority

DE 19704646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857800A2] A sleeved garment, where the join (15,16) between sleeve (13,14) and body (12) is perpendicular to the shoulder (17,18), is knitted in one piece on a twin bed flat knitting machine. The sleeves (13,14) and body (12) are knitted initially on separate yarn guides as tubular fabrics, with used needles in one bed being opposite empty needles in the other bed. The joins (15,16) are made with a single yarn guide by first knitting a row on both sleeves and body in the first direction of travel of the carriage. The stitches of the back of the right sleeve are transferred to the empty needles on the front needle bed and the stitches of the front of the left sleeve are transferred to the opposing needles on the back needle bed. Both needle beds are moved and the stitches of the right sleeve are moved from the front to the back bed near the body and into empty needles near the sleeve, with an analogous operation for the left sleeve. The needle beds are returned to their starting position and the stitches of the back of the left sleeve and the left edge region of the body are transferred from the front to the back needle bed. Similarly the front of the right sleeve and the right region of the body are transferred from the back to the front needle bed. Several rows of stitches are then knitted on the front bed near the body and both sleeves, after which several rows are knitted on the body only. This is followed by a similar procedure on the back needle bed. The whole cycle is repeated till the join is complete. Similar independent claims describe the stitch pattern for joining sleeves where the join is at an angle to the shoulder and for joining Raglan sleeves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 7/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01); D04B 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857800 A2 19980812; EP 0857800 A3 20000315; EP 0857800 B1 20040414; EP 0857800 B2 20071226; CN 1086750 C 20020626; CN 1196414 A 19981021; DE 19704646 A1 19980813; DE 19704646 B4 20050203; ES 2219791 T3 20041201; JP 3013242 B2 20000228; JP H1161603 A 19990305; US 5916272 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140115

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080406

2007-12-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071226

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2006-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-03-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD.

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219791 T3

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811169 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020821

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI