Global Patent Index - EP 0857801 A3

EP 0857801 A3 2000-03-15 - Method for manufacturing a knitted article

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a knitted article

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Maschenware

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un article tricoté

Publication

EP 0857801 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100610 A

Priority

DE 19704806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857801A2] A method of joining fabrics by a casting off operation on a flat bed knitting machine with at least two needle beds involves knitting both fabrics on separate needle beds (V,H) so that their front face (11.1, 12.1), which forms the outside of the finished garment, faces in, i.e. towards the gap (13) between the needle beds (V,H).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857801 A2 19980812; EP 0857801 A3 20000315; EP 0857801 B1 20030409; DE 19704806 A1 19980813; ES 2191873 T3 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040116

2005-01-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191873 T3

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI