Global Patent Index - EP 0857821 A3

EP 0857821 A3 2000-03-29 - Suction device

Title (en)

Suction device

Title (de)

Saugeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0857821 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101138 A

Priority

DE 29701986 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5974684A] A suction device for a machine to produce a fibrous pulp web is provided that includes a suction unit extending transverse to a web run direction over a width of the web, a vacuum source coupled to the end of the suction unit, and a plurality of suction openings distributed over the web width, where the plurality of suction openings form an entire suction zone extending over the width of the web, and where the entire suction zone includes a plurality of partial suction zones successively arranged transverse to the web run direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/10; D21F 1/52; F26B 13/16; F26B 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/52 (2006.01); D21F 3/10 (2006.01); F26B 13/16 (2006.01); F26B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/52 (2013.01); D21F 3/10 (2013.01); F26B 13/16 (2013.01); F26B 13/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/361 (2013.01); B65H 2406/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29701986 U1 19970327; EP 0857821 A2 19980812; EP 0857821 A3 20000329; US 5974684 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6D 21F 3/10 A, 6D 21F 1/52 B, 6F 26B 13/16 B, 6F 26B 13/30 B

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI