Global patent index - EP 0857849 A3

EP 0857849 A3 2000-03-22 - Method and device for the assembly of insulating glazing panels

Title (en)

Method and device for the assembly of insulating glazing panels

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbauen von Isolierglasscheiben

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'assemblage de vitrages isolants

Publication

EP 0857849 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101675 A

Priority

DE 19704880 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857849A2] The method involves conveying one inclined-to-the-horizontal pane up to a first position on a first track. Another pane is similarly conveyed inclined up to a second position on the first track. Both panes are moved onto a second track parallel to the first, and a third pane is conveyed on the first track into the first position. A fourth panel is conveyed on the first track into the second position, and either the first and second, or the third and fourth, panes support a spacer holder frame on their non-supported face. Pairs of panes are positioned parallel spaced from each other and transferred into a press. The two pairs are simultaneously assembled into two insulating blanks by parallel displacement of the first and second, or third and fourth, panes. The blanks are pressed simultaneously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67365 (2013.01); E06B 3/67343 (2013.01); E06B 3/67386 (2013.01); E06B 3/67347 (2013.01); E06B 3/67373 (2013.01); E06B 3/67382 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0857849 A2 19980812; EP 0857849 A3 20000322; EP 0857849 B1 20040317; AT 262106 T 20040415; DE 19704880 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-01-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810963

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-09-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE ASSEMBLY AND SEALING OF INSULATING GLAZING PANELS

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030424

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI