Global Patent Index - EP 0857912 B1

EP 0857912 B1 2000-02-09 - Insulation for a spherical tank

Title (en)

Insulation for a spherical tank

Title (de)

Wärmedämmung für einen Kugeltank

Title (fr)

Isolation pour un réservoir sphérique

Publication

EP 0857912 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118133 A

Priority

DE 19703591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0857912A1] This novel thermal insulation is for spherical tanks holding cryogenic fluids, i.e. liquified gases. Its insulating covering (13) comprises panels (14) fastened to the tank surface. Around the tank equator, there is an annular skirt (11), inside which mouldings (15) are fastened. The new feature is a gap (21) located between the insulating covering of the lower hemisphere and the mouldings. Radially, this gap climbs towards the exterior. Preferably, a seal (24) used in the construction comprises a cryogenic material, e.g. polyimide foam or mineral wool. Also used is an aluminium composite foil. The main insulation is a polystyrene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/04 (2006.01); B65D 90/02 (2006.01); F17C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 3/04 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0358 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0161 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703591 A1 19980806; EP 0857912 A1 19980812; EP 0857912 B1 20000209; EP 0915284 A1 19990512; EP 0915284 B1 20010822; ES 2142130 T3 20000401; ES 2163311 T3 20020116; JP 3223248 B2 20011029; JP H10220692 A 19980821; KR 100254848 B1 20000501; NO 20004232 A 19980803; NO 20004232 D0 20000823; NO 310743 B1 20010820; NO 980425 A 19980803; NO 980425 D0 19980130; PT 857912 E 20000731; PT 915284 E 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011113

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031018

2002-10-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142130 T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701110 20000316

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR PT

1999-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR PT

1999-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR PT

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980421

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR PT

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI