Global patent index - EP 0858013 A3

EP 0858013 A3 2000-09-27 - Projection clock

Title (en)

Projection clock

Title (de)

Projektionsuhr

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'horlogerie avec indication du temps par projection

Publication

EP 0858013 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200289 A

Priority

NL 1005150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858013A2] A projection clock (1) is described, comprising a housing (2) with an emission opening (7) for a light beam (14). The housing (2) comprises at least a light source (10), a clock with a reflecting dial (11), and a lens (16). During operation of the projection clock (1), a light beam (14) coming from the light source (10) is at least reflected by the rflecting dial (11) of the clock and then issues from the housing via the lens (16). The housing (2) is further provided with at least one light-directing member (12). The mutual positions of the light source (10), the reflecting dial (11) of the clock, the light-directing member (12), and the lens (16) are such that the light beam (14) is reflected both by the reflecting dial (11) of the clock and by the light-directing member (12) before this light beam (14) leaves the housing via the lens (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0858013 A2 19980812; EP 0858013 A3 20000927; NL 1005150 C1 19980803

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040621

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRESENT TIME BV

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI