Global Patent Index - EP 0858058 A3

EP 0858058 A3 2000-05-17 - Co-dispensing snack food product and beverages from a vending machine

Title (en)

Co-dispensing snack food product and beverages from a vending machine

Title (de)

Verkaufsautomat für Getränke und Imbissprodukte

Title (fr)

Distribution conjointe d'un-cas et de boissons a partir d'un distributeur automatique

Publication

EP 0858058 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200845 A

Priority

  • EP 95929480 A
  • US 28953794 A
  • US 41960595 A
  • US 48266095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9605578A1] A process for co-dispensing beverages and snack food products from a single vending machine. Filled beverage containers and filled snack food containers are stored in the vending machine and a buyer, upon payment, product selection, etc., can obtain both a beverage, e.g., a soft drink, and a snack food, e.g., corn chips, from a single machine. The beverage and snack food containers preferably are of substantially the same size so that a vending machine of the type which dispenses containers having a uniform size may be used to carry out the present invention. Also, an automatic door-opening mechanism is disclosed which opens the dispensing door of a vending machine when a snack food container is dispensed which is too light to open the door under the force of gravity. A process and apparatus for packaging snack food product in containers are also disclosed wherein accurately sized portions of the product are formed and fed into a funnel member, the funnel member having troughs which align the product in a desired direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/00 (2006.01); A47F 1/10 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 9/10 (2006.01); G07F 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 11/04 (2006.01); G07F 11/10 (2006.01); G07F 11/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/10 (2013.01); A47F 1/10 (2013.01); G07F 9/02 (2013.01); G07F 11/04 (2013.01); G07F 11/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9605578 A1 19960222; AT 233928 T 20030315; AU 3321895 A 19960307; AU 703172 B2 19990318; BR 9508574 A 20020507; CA 2197421 A1 19960222; CA 2197421 C 20010605; CN 1159239 A 19970910; DE 69529826 D1 20030410; EP 0775349 A1 19970528; EP 0775349 B1 20030305; EP 0858058 A2 19980812; EP 0858058 A3 20000517; ES 2193199 T3 20031101; JP H10504411 A 19980428; KR 100321879 B1 20020201; MX 9701118 A 19970531

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010803

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 775349

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE