Global Patent Index - EP 0858268 B1

EP 0858268 B1 2000-04-12 - SHIRT WITH COLLAR

Title (en)

SHIRT WITH COLLAR

Title (de)

OBERHEMD MIT KRAGEN

Title (fr)

CHEMISE/CHEMISIER AVEC COL

Publication

EP 0858268 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96924754 A

Priority

  • DE 9601321 W
  • DE 19540700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19540700A1] The invention relates to a shirt, preferably a man's shirt, with a collar (40) attached thereto and a left-hand and a right-hand chest blank (18) which close in the chest area with an underlap having buttons or overlap (24) having button-holes (36, 38). A reinforcement area is provided which is bounded in a substantially triangular manner by three edges, i.e. a first edge (46) which is connected to the underlap or the overlap (24), a second edge (48) connected to the collar and a third edge (50) connected to the chest blank. There is a button or a button hole (36) below the collar (40) and level with the first edge (46).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 3/00; A41B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 1/20 (2006.01); A41B 1/00 (2006.01); A41B 3/00 (2006.01); A41D 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 3/00 (2013.01); A41B 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19540700 A1 19970507; AT 191616 T 20000415; AU 6512496 A 19970522; EP 0858268 A1 19980819; EP 0858268 B1 20000412; JP 2000510538 A 20000815; US 6112329 A 20000905; WO 9716081 A1 19970509

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604968

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191616 T

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020719

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DANIELS & KORFF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011020

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604968 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191616 T 20000415

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980313

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL