Global Patent Index - EP 0858278 B8

EP 0858278 B8 2002-11-13 - DEEP-FRYING DEVICE

Title (en)

DEEP-FRYING DEVICE

Title (de)

FRITIERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FRITURE

Publication

EP 0858278 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97924201 A

Priority

  • EP 97924201 A
  • EP 96202144 A
  • IB 9700710 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804174A1] A deep-frying device comprising a reservoir (3), a discharge channel (11) for discharging fumes (A), and a converter (12) for converting volatile organic compounds into carbon dioxide and water, has a passage (14) for the admixture of ambient air (B, C) to the fumes (A) exuded during deep-frying. This provides an improved odour reduction. In the case of upstream admixture additional oxygen is available, as a result of which a more complete conversion is achieved. In the case of downstream admixture, conversion is possible at a higher temperature without a corresponding rise in the temperature of the discharged mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 37/12; F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01); A47J 36/38 (2006.01); A47J 37/12 (2006.01); B01D 53/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47J 36/38 (2013.01); A47J 37/1223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804174 A1 19980205; DE 69712459 D1 20020613; DE 69712459 T2 20030109; EP 0858278 A1 19980819; EP 0858278 B1 20020508; EP 0858278 B8 20021113; JP 3909868 B2 20070425; JP H11512964 A 19991109; US 5924414 A 19990720

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-07-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170616

2017-06-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69712459

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PHILIPS NORDEN AB, , SE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS NORDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PHILIPS NORDEN AB, , SE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS NORDEN AB, STOCKHOLM, SE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS NORDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS NORDEN AB, STOCKHOLM, SE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69712459

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20140327

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69712459 20020613

2002-06-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991007

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980805

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: PHILIPS NORDEN AB

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB