Global Patent Index - EP 0858329 B1

EP 0858329 B1 2003-06-04 - NOVEL STABLE LIQUID PARACETAMOL COMPOSITIONS, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME

Title (en)

NOVEL STABLE LIQUID PARACETAMOL COMPOSITIONS, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME

Title (de)

NEUE STABILE FLÜSSIGE PARACETAMOLMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES FORMULATIONS LIQUIDES STABLES A BASE DE PARACETAMOL ET LEUR MODE DE PREPARATION

Publication

EP 0858329 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97936739 A

Priority

  • FR 9701452 W
  • FR 9609858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2751875A1] Novel stable paracetamol compositions for use in therapeutic chemistry and specifically galenic pharmacy are disclosed. The compositions contain a solution of paracetamol in an aqueous solvent combined with a buffer having a pH of 4 to 8, and a free radical capturing agent. A water-insoluble inert gas is carefully bubbled through the aqueous solvent to remove oxygen from the medium. Said compositions may also be combined with a centrally or peripherally acting analgesic agent, and are provided as injectable compositions for relieving pain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/165; A61K 47/02; A61K 47/12; A61K 47/20; A61K 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 31/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 47/02 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01); A61K 47/20 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 31/167 (2013.01); A61K 31/485 (2013.01); A61K 47/02 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/12 (2013.01); A61K 47/183 (2013.01); A61K 47/20 (2013.01); A61K 47/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/485 + A61K 31/165
  2. A61K 31/485 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2751875 A1 19980206; FR 2751875 B1 19981224; AP 957 A 20010412; AP 9801223 A0 19980630; AT 241972 T 20030615; AU 3945197 A 19980225; AU 742576 B2 20020110; BR 9702362 A 19991228; CA 2233924 A1 19980212; CA 2233924 C 20120821; CN 1133426 C 20040107; CN 1204960 A 19990113; CZ 298427 B6 20071003; CZ 9801048 A3 19980916; DE 69722580 D1 20030710; DE 69722580 T2 20040429; DK 0858329 T3 20030929; EP 0858329 A1 19980819; EP 0858329 B1 20030604; ES 2201316 T3 20040316; HU 226117 B1 20080428; HU 9901893 A2 19990928; HU 9901893 A3 20000628; JP 2010163462 A 20100729; JP 5060681 B2 20121031; JP 5122604 B2 20130116; JP H11514013 A 19991130; MX 9802734 A 19981130; NZ 330136 A 20000327; OA 10678 A 20021120; PL 193104 B1 20070131; PL 326069 A1 19980817; PT 858329 E 20030930; RU 2192249 C2 20021110; US 6028222 A 20000222; WO 9805314 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170806

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170816

2017-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170805

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170804

2017-10-18 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 241972 T

- Effective date: 20170805

2017-08-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170804

2017-08-09 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170804

2017-08-07 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170805

2017-08-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722580

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201316 T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403447

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-09-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722580 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980805

1998-09-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIETLIN, FRANCOIS

1998-09-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FREDJ, DANIELE

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE