Global Patent Index - EP 0858332 A4

EP 0858332 A4 2001-02-28 - TRITERPENE DERIVATIVES WITH IMMUNOSUPPRESSANT ACTIVITY

Title (en)

TRITERPENE DERIVATIVES WITH IMMUNOSUPPRESSANT ACTIVITY

Title (de)

TRITERPENDERIVATE MIT IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVER WIRKUNG

Title (fr)

DERIVES TRITERPENES POSSEDANT UNE ACTIVITE IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE

Publication

EP 0858332 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96938708 A

Priority

  • GB 9603842 A
  • GB 9609665 A
  • US 9617482 W
  • US 608595 P
  • US 609295 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716182A1] The compounds of Formula (I) are useful as immunosuppressive agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/335; A61K 31/585; C07D 313/06; C07D 493/04; A61K 31/365; A61P 37/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/336 (2006.01); A61K 31/365 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 493/04 (2013.01); A61K 31/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] ISAO KITAGAWA ET AL.: "Indonesian Medicinal Plants. XI. Chemical Structures of Caesaldekarins a and b, Two New Cassane-Type Furanoditerpenes from the Roots of Caesalpinia major", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., vol. 42, no. 9, 1994, japan, pages 1798 - 1802, XP002156009
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 08 29 September 1995 (1995-09-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 025 (C - 0903) 22 January 1992 (1992-01-22)
  • See also references of WO 9716182A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716182 A1 19970509; AU 707991 B2 19990729; AU 7602096 A 19970522; CA 2237607 A1 19970509; EP 0858332 A1 19980819; EP 0858332 A4 20010228; JP 2002503201 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/335 A, 7A 61K 31/585 B, 7C 07D 313/06 B, 7C 07D 493/04 B, 7A 61K 31/365 B, 7A 61P 37/06 B

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980602

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE