Global Patent Index - EP 0858358 B1

EP 0858358 B1 2000-09-13 - STATIONARY EXERCISE DEVICE

Title (en)

STATIONARY EXERCISE DEVICE

Title (de)

STATIONÄRES ÜBUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EXERCICE PHYSIQUE STATIONNAIRE

Publication

EP 0858358 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97932280 A

Priority

  • US 9711032 W
  • US 67051596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2228767A1] An exercise device includes a pair of foot engaging links (30a, 30b). The rearward ends of the foot links are supported for rotational motion about a pivot axis (26), and the forward ends of the foot links reciprocate back and forth along a guide (36). The combination of these two foot link motions permits the users feet to travel along an elliptical path of travel. The inclination and/or elevation of the guide (36) may be selectively altered to vary the nature of the stepping motion experienced by the user. At lower inclinations/elevations of the guide, the stepping motion may resemble cross country skiing. At progressively higher angles of inclination or elevations of the guide (36), the stepping motions may simulate walking, jogging, running and climbing. The connection of the foot links to the pivot axis allow motion in a direction orthogonal to the rotational motion, thus compensating for alignment inconsistencies of the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 1/02 (2006.01); A63B 23/04 (2006.01); A63B 21/005 (2006.01); A63B 21/015 (2006.01); A63B 21/22 (2006.01); A63B 22/02 (2006.01); A63B 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0023 (2013.01); A63B 22/0015 (2013.01); A63B 22/0664 (2013.01); A63B 21/0052 (2013.01); A63B 21/015 (2013.01); A63B 21/225 (2013.01); A63B 22/205 (2013.01); A63B 2022/067 (2013.01); A63B 2220/34 (2013.01); A63B 2230/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

AU 3577797 A 19980114; BR 9702329 A 19990720; CA 2228767 A1 19971231; CA 2228767 C 20040831; CN 1119186 C 20030827; CN 1210472 A 19990310; CN 1494936 A 20040512; DE 69703086 D1 20001019; DE 69703086 T2 20010118; DE 69733216 D1 20050609; DE 69733216 T2 20060119; EP 0858358 A1 19980819; EP 0858358 B1 20000913; ES 2151739 T3 20010101; HK 1015721 A1 20010720; JP 4020970 B2 20071212; JP H11512953 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-06-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151739 T3

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703086 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980606

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT