Global patent index - EP 0858455 A4

EP 0858455 A4 2000-04-12 - 4-OXA AND 4-THIA STEROIDS

Title (en)

4-OXA AND 4-THIA STEROIDS

Title (de)

4-OXA- UND 4-THIA-STEROIDE

Title (fr)

STEROIDES 4-OXA ET 4-THIA

Publication

EP 0858455 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96936811 A

Priority

  • GB 9602905 A
  • US 9616883 W
  • US 600195 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715564A1] The compounds of the present invention are those of structural formula (I) wherein X is oxygen or sulfur. Pharmaceutical compositions and methods of use of the compounds in the treatment of hyperandrogenic conditions are disclosed. In addition, the combination of the compounds with other active agents such as finasteride, minoxidil and retinoic acid or a derivative thereof is disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 311/78; A61K 31/35; A61K 31/38; C07D 335/04; C07J 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/58 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/28 (2006.01); C07J 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 73/006 (2013.01); C07J 73/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715564 A1 19970501; AU 713582 B2 19991202; AU 7464496 A 19970515; CA 2233966 A1 19970501; EP 0858455 A1 19980819; EP 0858455 A4 20000412; JP H11513981 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 311/78 A, 7C 07D 335/04 B, 7C 07J 73/00 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980526

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE