Global Patent Index - EP 0858494 B1

EP 0858494 B1 2000-02-09 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE FORMATION OF CARBON DEPOSITS, METALLIC COMPONENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE FORMATION OF CARBON DEPOSITS, METALLIC COMPONENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFABLAGERUNGEN, METALLISCHER STOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHEMISCHEN SUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE LA FORMATION DE DEPOTS DE CARBONE, COMPOSE METALLIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES

Publication

EP 0858494 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96937304 A

Priority

  • DE 19542219 A
  • EP 9604728 W
  • US 1140196 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716507A1] The invention relates to a process for reducing the formation of catalytically induced carbon deposits (coking) on the surfaces of components designed as heat exchangers, conduits or containers and made of a heat-resistant material that consists of a heat-resistant alloy containing Cr and at least one of the two elements Fe and Ni, whereas the components are exposed to hot carbonaceous process gases in process plants for producing chemical substances, especially plants for converting hydrocarbons or other substances containing C through thermal or catalytic cracking or through steam reforming or plants for producing a CO-rich reduction gas, wherein an Al-enrichment is carried out in the surface region by means of diffusion annealing in an atmosphere containing Al. Diffusion annealing is carried out in the temperature range of 900 to 1200 DEG C at least for a part of the treatment time in an atmosphere containing Cr, until a Cr-enrichment having a penetration depth of at least 20 mu m is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/16; C10G 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C10G 9/16 (2006.01); C10G 9/20 (2006.01); C10G 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/16 (2013.01); C10G 9/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716507 A1 19970509; AT 189693 T 20000215; AU 719778 B2 20000518; AU 7496296 A 19970522; CA 2236091 A1 19970509; CN 1201480 A 19981209; EP 0858494 A1 19980819; EP 0858494 B1 20000209; HU 9900820 A2 19990628; HU 9900820 A3 20010228; JP H11514681 A 19991214; NO 981943 A 19980429; NO 981943 D0 19980429; PL 326370 A1 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606654 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189693 T 20000215

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-07-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE FORMATION OF CARBON DEPOSITS, METALLIC COMPONENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE