Global Patent Index - EP 0858535 B1

EP 0858535 B1 2000-07-05 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR EXCAVATION USING AN EARTH CUTTER, AND CONSTRUCTION FILLING IN THE EXCAVATION

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR EXCAVATION USING AN EARTH CUTTER, AND CONSTRUCTION FILLING IN THE EXCAVATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANLEGEN VON BODENEINSCHNITTEN UND DEREN BAUKONSTRUKTIVE VERFÜLLUNG HIERZU

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXCAVATION METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE LAME DE SOL, ET REMBLAIEMENT DE L'EXCAVATION

Publication

EP 0858535 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945849 A

Priority

  • DE 9602076 W
  • DE 19540597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716605A2] The process and apparatus are characterized by a kinematic, rotatively mounted, bladed or lunated earth-working tool of slight depth, greater width and great length overall, termed an "earth cutter", which penetrates the ground vertically, horizontally or in a pivoted sweep with percussive and pressure-pulsed force, subject to oscillatory pulse control in an energy-minimizing resonance operation, which can destroy buried erratics while at the same time compressing and thereby stabilizing the exposed walls of the excavation, and by special designs in the apparatus that provide for continuous work flow of fill-in construction in the excavation made. The attendant construction work can be a structure-remote drainage system which with moisture-stopping troughs near the ground surface not only captures underground water flows, but also drains off surface water, so that the ground dries out and solidifies and that ground structures integrated in this wide-ranging system are also dried out free of excavated material, while any existing structures built into the ground are circumvented. When the construction is a drainage system, the latter can be ventilated by building in specially designed channel plates together with, for example, windmill-operated central shafts, so that incident groundwater not only is collected and carried off in liquid form, but is evaporated by the underground ventilation in the system of walled drains and so conveyed to the outside air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 5/02 (2006.01); E02F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 5/02 (2013.01); E02F 5/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716605 A2 19970509; WO 9716605 A3 20010913; AT 194401 T 20000715; EP 0858535 A2 19980819; EP 0858535 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2001-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010720

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605553 20000810

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194401 T 20000715

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990727

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980427

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE