Global Patent Index - EP 0858551 B1

EP 0858551 B1 2000-03-22 - TRANSITION ELEMENT BETWEEN COMPONENTS OF THE FLUE GAS DUCT OF A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

TRANSITION ELEMENT BETWEEN COMPONENTS OF THE FLUE GAS DUCT OF A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

ÜBERGANGSELEMENT ZWISCHEN KOMPONENTEN DES RAUCHGASKANALS EINER GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE TRANSITION ENTRE DES ELEMENTS CONSTITUTIFS DU CANAL DE GAZ BRULES D'UNE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0858551 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945509 A

Priority

  • DE 9601980 W
  • DE 19540606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716628A2] In order to reduce material stresses between components (8, 10) of the flue gas duct (4) during the operation of a gas turbine (2), the invention proposes a transition element (30, 30') between the components (8, 10). The transition element comprises a first heat-insulation element (34, 34') whose thickness (d) varies as a function of a local variable (x) along the flue gas duct (4) in order to set a predetermined temperature profile in a transition region (36, 36'). In order to permit the transition from an outwardly insulated component (8) to an inwardly insulated component (10), advantageously a second heat-insulation element (40) is provided whose thickness (d') varies inversely to the thickness (d) of the first heat-insulation element (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716628 A2 19970509; WO 9716628 A3 19970703; EP 0858551 A2 19980819; EP 0858551 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604798

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060105

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604798 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990503

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980420

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE