Global Patent Index - EP 0858574 B1

EP 0858574 B1 2000-04-26 - DEVICE FOR HEAT TREATMENT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HEAT TREATMENT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0858574 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927710 A

Priority

  • AT 138095 A
  • EP 9603533 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707362A1] A device for the heat treatment of a material, which device has a kiln chamber (2) for the heat treatment material and at least one preferably cylindrical heating furnace (4a, 4b) arranged on the upper surface of the kiln chamber (2) and in which at least one burner (12a, 12b) is provided for producing fuel gas which is fed in a substantially tangential manner into the heating furnace (4a, 4b) with the result that a downwardly directed, whirling fuel gas flow forms inside the heating furnace (4a, 4b), and a fuel gas flow with a slightly frustoconical boundary forms below each heating furnace (4a, 4b) in the kiln chamber (2), wherein respective means (23a, 23b) for determining the temperature of the fuel gas is associated with each heating furnace (4a, 4b), and this means (23a, 23b) is arranged inside the cone (13a, 13b) of fuel gas of only this particular heating furnace (4a, 4b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 3/00; C21D 1/52; F23C 7/06; F27D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/52 (2006.01); F23C 3/00 (2006.01); F23C 7/06 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01); F27B 17/00 (2006.01); F27D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 17/0016 (2013.01); C21D 1/52 (2013.01); F23C 3/006 (2013.01); F23C 7/06 (2013.01); F23M 5/085 (2013.01); F27D 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707362 A1 19970227; AT 402736 B 19970825; AT A138095 A 19961215; DE 59605069 D1 20000531; EP 0858574 A1 19980819; EP 0858574 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-03-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040301

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605069 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-04-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT